U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01186
  • Case Name: Martinez v. Wal-Mart Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Stipulation]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 25, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 24, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • February 28, 2022: [Substitute Party]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 18, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • February 04, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • February 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Docket]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • December 22, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • December 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • December 17, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.