U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01190
  • Case Name: Hannay et al v. Bethany City of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • March 24, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • March 22, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 22, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • December 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.