U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01196
  • Case Name: Carnes v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • January 12, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 02, 2023: [Brief]
  • January 02, 2023: [Attorney Fees]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
  • July 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 18, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 14, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • April 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • April 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • February 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 23, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
  • December 23, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.