U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01201
  • Case Name: Hurt v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Stipulation]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • March 07, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 03, 2022: [Remand]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • January 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order]
  • December 29, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 28, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.