U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01202
  • Case Name: Brandt v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 07, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 06, 2022: [Reminder - General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 23, 2022: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • May 23, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • April 07, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • April 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 07, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
  • December 29, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.