U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01205
  • Case Name: Poinsett v. New York Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 24, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 16, 2023: [Exclude]
  • January 13, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Stipulation]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 09, 2023: [Objections]
  • January 06, 2023: [Witness List]
  • January 06, 2023: [Exhibit List]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 17, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • October 11, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • October 10, 2022: [Witness List]
  • October 10, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • October 10, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Surreply]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • August 22, 2022: [Leave]
  • August 17, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 04, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • July 15, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • July 15, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • July 13, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 08, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • April 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 09, 2022: [Docket]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Leave]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 30, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 30, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 30, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.