U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00018
  • Case Name: Oklahoma Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company v. Omega Flex Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 13, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Certificate]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Docket]
  • March 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 07, 2022: [Receipt]
  • January 06, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.