U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00020
  • Case Name: AllNations Bank v. Phillips et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Docket]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 22, 2022: [Leave]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Supplement]
  • January 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.