U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00030
  • Case Name: James V. Murray Revocable Living Trust v. Sentinel Insurance Company LTD
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 22, 2022: [Sealed Response]
  • November 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 21, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 03, 2022: [Objections]
  • November 01, 2022: [Exclude]
  • November 01, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 21, 2022: [Witness List]
  • October 21, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • October 07, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • October 07, 2022: [Witness List]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • May 10, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 02, 2022: [Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Docket]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 20, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 11, 2022: [Docket]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.