U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00039
  • Case Name: Thomas v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 07, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
  • November 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 18, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 18, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 15, 2022: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 15, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • June 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • May 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 14, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 13, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 13, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.