U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00038
  • Case Name: Thomas v. Oklahoma Motor Credit Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 10, 2022: [Docket]
  • March 09, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 15, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.