U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Cole et al v. AMC Military Housing et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Clarify]
  • February 09, 2022: [Receipt]
  • February 07, 2022: [Disclosure]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 27, 2022: [Supplement]
  • January 26, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 25, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • January 18, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • January 18, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • January 18, 2022: [Certificate]
  • January 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • January 17, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • January 17, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.