U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00040
  • Case Name: Topkov v. Grubb et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Address Change]
December, 2024
  • December 14, 2024: [Bifurcate]
November, 2024
  • November 01, 2024: [~Notice (other)]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 15, 2022: [Strike]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 13, 2022: [Docket]
  • July 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 07, 2022: [Leave]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Discovery]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 18, 2022: [Sanctions]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Surreply]
  • March 03, 2022: [Surreply]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Reply]
  • March 02, 2022: [Leave to File Reply]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • February 25, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 21, 2022: [Surreply]
  • February 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 18, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 31, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 18, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.