U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00046
  • Case Name: Shobert v. Sam's West Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 20, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 05, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Witness List]
  • November 21, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 16, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 03, 2022: [Docket]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • January 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 18, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • January 18, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 18, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.