U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Lanessa L Graham v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 16, 2022: [Costs Taxed]
  • March 14, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • March 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • March 10, 2022: [Remand]
  • March 10, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.