U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00060
  • Case Name: Gordon v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 13, 2023: [Leave]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 21, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • December 21, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Exhibit List]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • April 04, 2022: [Docket]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • March 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 20, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.