U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00082
  • Case Name: Oklahoma Stud Ranch Inc v. Helzer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Judgment - Default]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • May 04, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • May 03, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 28, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 20, 2022: [Leave]
  • April 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 02, 2022: [Receipt]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.