U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00089
  • Case Name: Doe v. Kingfisher Independent School District No 7 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 10, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 10, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 13, 2022: [Sealed Reply]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • June 13, 2022: [Leave]
  • June 06, 2022: [Sealed Response]
  • June 03, 2022: [Protective Order]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • May 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 23, 2022: [Seal]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • May 10, 2022: [Seal]
  • May 09, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 09, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 09, 2022: [Leave]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 04, 2022: [Leave]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 14, 2022: [Leave]
  • April 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • March 03, 2022: [Docket]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • February 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • February 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.