U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00091
  • Case Name: Rudman et al v. Oklahoma State of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 24, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 23, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 10, 2022: [Strike]
  • June 08, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 04, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • April 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 02, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.