U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00103
  • Case Name: Moon v. Oklahoma Department of Corrections
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • December 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Compel]
  • December 12, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • December 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • December 01, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • November 30, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 30, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • November 30, 2022: [Witness List]
  • November 17, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 09, 2022: [Docket]
  • March 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 07, 2022: [Receipt]
  • February 03, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.