U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00104
  • Case Name: Martha v. Verizon Wireless Services LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Leave]
  • April 15, 2022: [Set Aside Default]
  • April 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • April 07, 2022: [Entry of Default]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 07, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 04, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.