U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Wakley v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • December 12, 2022: [Objections]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • November 28, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 23, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 25, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 24, 2022: [Docket]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • February 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • February 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • February 07, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • February 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 07, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.