U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Rattler-Bryceland et al v. Boutchantharaj Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Docket]
  • June 01, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 14, 2022: [Compel]
  • March 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • February 25, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 08, 2022: [Receipt]
  • February 04, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.