U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00110
  • Case Name: Patton v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 25, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • August 03, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • June 01, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Reminder - General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 22, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • April 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • March 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 09, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 07, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
  • February 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.