U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00111
  • Case Name: Howell v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Brief]
  • January 20, 2023: [Attorney Fees]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • October 18, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • October 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 16, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • May 12, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • May 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 09, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 09, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
  • February 09, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.