U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00122
  • Case Name: Coleman v. Goodwill Industries of Central Oklahoma Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 03, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 06, 2022: [Dismiss]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 23, 2022: [Leave]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 09, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 09, 2022: [Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 12, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.