U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00123
  • Case Name: Barnard v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • July 26, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • July 22, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 22, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • July 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 20, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • June 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • May 31, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 11, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.