U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00151
  • Case Name: Shaffer et al v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 12, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 12, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2025
  • January 04, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: [Exclude]
  • October 04, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Status Report]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Other Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 13, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Brief]
  • April 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 29, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order]
  • March 24, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • March 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • February 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • February 24, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • February 24, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • February 21, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • February 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.