U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00155
  • Case Name: Adams v. National Health Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • January 12, 2023: [Terminate Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • November 16, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Docket]
  • March 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • February 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • February 22, 2022: [Receipt]
  • February 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.