U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00159
  • Case Name: Stanley v. Wifa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Objections]
  • January 24, 2023: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 10, 2023: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
  • November 11, 2022: [Reply]
  • November 04, 2022: [Objections]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • October 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 08, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • October 03, 2022: [Protective Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • September 28, 2022: [Quash]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
June, 2022
  • June 20, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 27, 2022: [Certificate of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • April 07, 2022: [Docket]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 02, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.