U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00168
  • Case Name: Howard v. Baca et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 23, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • March 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 27, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • February 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.