U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00169
  • Case Name: Lafferrandre v. Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • April 20, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • March 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Pending Motions]
  • March 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • February 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 28, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.