U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00164
  • Case Name: Jefferson v. Del City City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • March 10, 2022: [Remand]
  • March 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 03, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 01, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.