U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00176
  • Case Name: Great American Insurance Company v. Cimarron Tank Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment - Default]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Default Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • June 17, 2022: [Default Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 02, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.