U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00177
  • Case Name: Halverson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • July 06, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Change Venue]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Affidavit of Service - NON SUMMONS]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 02, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 01, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.