U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00179
  • Case Name: Mcmaster v. Lewis et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Docket]
  • March 11, 2025: [Witness List - Expert]
  • March 11, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 11, 2025: [Exhibit List]
December, 2024
  • December 11, 2024: [Exhibit List]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • December 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 05, 2022: [Withdraw]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Compel]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • July 29, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Docket]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 03, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 02, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.