U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00213
  • Case Name: Carter v. Louisiana Machinery Company LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 06, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 07, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Docket]
  • April 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 22, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 17, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.