U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00211
  • Case Name: Giles v. Tops Holdco LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Protective Order]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • April 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 22, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • March 17, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • March 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • March 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 16, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.