U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00216
  • Case Name: Crews v. Austin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order for Response]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 23, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • June 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.