U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00658
  • Case Name: Lynn v. DCP Services, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • May 24, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 21, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 18, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.