U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00238
  • Case Name: Betterton v. World Acceptance Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 03, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Remand]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • April 11, 2022: [Substitute Party]
  • April 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.