U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00254
  • Case Name: Arndt et al v. Chleota Fire LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 23, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Compel]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.