U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00271
  • Case Name: Morrow v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • January 09, 2023: [Remand to Agency]
  • January 03, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 13, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 30, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • August 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
  • August 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
  • August 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
  • March 31, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.