U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00306
  • Case Name: Fowler et al v. Navy Federal Credit Union
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 09, 2023: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 15, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 01, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • August 12, 2022: [Docket]
  • August 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 02, 2022: [Counterclaim]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • July 28, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • July 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.