U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00326
  • Case Name: Hawzipta v. Kaw Nation Tribal Police Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Status Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 19, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 04, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 23, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 15, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 24, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 17, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • May 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 14, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 10, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 20, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • April 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.