U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00327
  • Case Name: Gregory v. Lindamood Heavy Hauling Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 05, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • September 02, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 01, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • September 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan]
  • August 03, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Reply]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • July 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
  • June 14, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • June 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 31, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • May 11, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2022: [Receipt]
  • April 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.