U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00329
  • Case Name: Byers et al v. CSAA General Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • January 25, 2023: [Supplement]
  • January 23, 2023: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 20, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 09, 2023: [Witness List - Expert]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 02, 2022: [Dismiss]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 13, 2022: [Strike]
  • May 13, 2022: [Docket]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • April 22, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • April 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • April 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.