U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00389
  • Case Name: Sibley v. Kane et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • July 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • June 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • June 07, 2022: [Supplement]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • May 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • May 12, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.