U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00393
  • Case Name: Anderson et al v. Department of Veterans Affairs
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 16, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.