U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00401
  • Case Name: Scott v. City of Oklahoma City et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 14, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • May 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 24, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • May 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 18, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.